Case Information: 49663 | |||
Short Caption: | KNIPES, II (MICHAEL) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Lincoln Co. - Seventh Judicial District - CR0913006 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 07/11/2008 | How Submitted: | On Briefs |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/20/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
06/20/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 07-13479 | |
07/23/2007 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 4/3/07, 4/4/07 and 5/11/07. Transcriptionist: Susan Hollis. (submitted by Lincoln County Clerk) | 07-16071 | |
08/01/2007 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: August 6, 2007. | 07-16880 | |
08/06/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Motion to Extend Time in Which to File Appellant's Fast Track Statement. | 07-17257 | |
08/15/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Fast Track Statement due: 30 days. | 07-18043 | |
09/14/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 07-20329 | |
09/18/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Fast track statement and appendix due: 30 days. Counsel is cautioned that further extensions of time will not be granted absent extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. | 07-20546 | |
10/18/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion for Full Briefing. | 07-23056 | |
10/25/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. and Directing Full Briefing. Opening Brief due: 30 days. Fn1 [This court notes that certified transcripts were filed in this appeal on July 23, 2007. But should either counsel cite to transcripts not previously prepared, counsel shall file and serve a request for the necessary transcripts pursuant to NRAP 9(a). If the necessary transcripts have already been prepared and are on file in the district court, the parties may include such transcripts in the appendix without filing a transcript request form.] | 07-23523 | |
11/21/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion and Order/Excess Pages. Granted: 34 pages. Opening Brief. | 07-25484 | |
11/21/2007 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 07-25485 | |
11/21/2007 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 and 2. | 07-25486 | |
12/20/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: January 23, 2008. | 07-27573 | |
01/17/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Deficient Brief. Returned Unfiled Respondent's Answering Brief and Appendix. Corrected brief due: 10 days. | 08-01376 | |
01/25/2008 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 08-02034 | |
02/25/2008 | Motion | Filed Stipulation and Order. Brief due: 3/26/08. | 08-05068 | |
03/28/2008 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | 08-07815 | |
07/11/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. | 08-17690 | |
07/11/2008 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. SNP08-JH/RP/MD | ||
10/02/2008 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before Hardesty/Parraguirre/Douglas. Author: Parraguirre, Ron. Majority: Parraguirre/Hardesty/Douglas. 124 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 79. SNP08/Hardesty/Parraguirre/Douglas. | 08-25444 | |
10/28/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 08-26255 | |
10/28/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
11/10/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 30, 2008. | 08-26255 |