Case Information: 49662 | |||
Short Caption: | BEACH VS. EMPLOYERS INS. CO. OF NEV. | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Carson City - First Judicial District - 0501567A | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 06/29/2007 / Berry, Robert | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/20/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
06/20/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 07-13398 | |
06/20/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. (Notice of appeal and amended aotice of appeal are included in same NOA packet.) | ||
06/27/2007 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 07-14050 | |
06/29/2007 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Robert G. Berry. | 07-14181 | |
07/31/2007 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled. | 07-16817 | |
09/24/2007 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. | 07-20976 | |
09/24/2007 | Motion | Filed Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Pursuant to Settlement Conference. | 07-20978 | |
09/28/2007 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. | 07-21462 | |
09/28/2007 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |