judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN RE: PARENTAL RIGHTS AS TO TOPPINGS

Case Information: 53547
Short Caption:IN RE: PARENTAL RIGHTS AS TO TOPPINGSCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - J297872
Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D387913
Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Parental Termination
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:05/11/2010How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/06/2009Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
04/06/2009Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Parental Termination/Counsel. (Notice re: parental termination expedited filing schedule mailed to all counsel.) 09-08558
04/06/2009Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days 09-08559
04/06/2009Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days 09-08560
04/23/2009Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. 09-10118
04/27/2009Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived. (Appellant: Lynn C. Toppings)
04/27/2009Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Parental Termination/Counsel. (Notice re: parental termination expedited filing schedule mailed to all counsel.) 09-10448
05/15/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Regarding Filing Fee, Transcript Requests, and Docketing Statements. Scott: 10 days to pay the filing fee. Both appellants: transcripts requests and docketing statements due 10 days. 09-12183
05/27/2009Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Romeo R. Perez - check no. 2552.
06/01/2009Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Appellant Lynn Toppings. 09-13524
06/01/2009Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 1/15/09, 1/20/09, 2/10/09, 2/13/09, and 3/02/09. To Court Reporter: 8th Judicial District Court, Family Division Court Reporter. (Appellant Lynn Toppings). 09-13639
06/30/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Imposing Conditional Sanctions. Scott M.'s failure to fully comply with our May 15 order warrants the conditional imposition of sanctions. Scott M. shall, within 15 days from the date of this order, pay the sum of $500.00 to the Supreme Court Law Library and provide this court with proof of such payment. This sanction shall be automatically vacated, however, if Scott M. files and serves the transcript request form or a certificate that no transcript will be requested and his docketing statement within ten days from the date of this order. 09-16138
07/07/2009Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Non-Payment for Appeal Transcripts. (submitted by S. Ajoub/Transcript Video Services) 09-16658
07/08/2009MotionFiled Motion. Ex-Parte Motion for Staying Order Imposing Conditional Sanctions. 09-16709
07/08/2009Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Appellant Scott M. 09-16710
07/08/2009Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 1/15/09, 2/13/09, 3/2/09. To Court Reporter: Family Court Services. (Appellant Scott M.) 09-16713
07/21/2009Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Opening Brief and Appendix. 09-17793
08/03/2009MotionFiled Motion. Representing Appellant - Scott Mercer, Romeo R. Perez, P.C. 09-18899
08/03/2009MotionFiled Motion. Ex Parte Motion for Late Filing. 09-18900
08/03/2009Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Ex Parte Motion for Late Filing. Due date: 10 days. 09-18901
09/01/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motion to Withdraw, Diecting Preparation of Transcripts, and Suspending the Briefing Schedule. Scott M.: 30 days to obtain new counsel and enter an appearance in this court. We direct Transcript Video Services to prepare transcripts for 1/15, 2/12 and 13, and 3/2/09 - due 40 days. Briefing suspended. Fn2 [The 7/8/09 motion to suspend is denied as moot.] Fn4 [Scott M.'s motion for an extension of time to file his opening brief is denied as moot.] 09-21276
09/18/2009MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 09-22673
10/16/2009TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Tammy Gonzales stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 1/15/09, 2/10/09, 2/13/09, 3/2/09. 09-25262
11/16/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Briefing Reinstated. and Directing Transmission of Record. The clerk of this court shall assign this appeal to the proper person pilot program for civil appeals. We direct the clerk of this court to provide each of the parties with a copy of the administrative order establishing the pilot program and the instructions for civil litigants without attorneys; the clerk shall also provide Scott M. with a civil proper person appeal statement form. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. Appellant Lynn C. T.'s Opening Brief due: 60 days. Appellant Scott M.'s Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement due: 60 days. Respondent's answering brief addressing both the opening brief and the civil appeal statement is due 30 days from the date when those documents are served. Lynn C.T. shall thereafter have 30 days from the date when the answering brief is served to file and serve any reply brief. fn1[In light of this order, Lynn C. T.'s motion for an extension of time to file the opening brief is denied as moot.] 09-27842
11/25/2009Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1-4. 09-28831
01/22/2010BriefFiled Opening Brief. Appellant - Lynn C. Toppings. 10-01873
02/16/2010BriefFiled Answering Brief. 10-04112
03/19/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Scott M. shall therefore have 15 days from the date of this order to either file and serve the civil proper person appeal statement or file and serve a response to this order addressing why the appeal should not be dismissed as abandoned as to Scott M. only. We caution Scott M. that his failure to comply with this order may result in the dismissal of his appeal. 10-07391
04/29/2010Case Status Update Briefing Completed. No reply brief filed.
05/11/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Oral argument will not be scheduled in this appeal, and it shall stand submitted on the record and the briefs filed herein, as of the date of this order. 10-12171
05/11/2010Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
07/20/2010Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP10-JH/MD/KP 10-18568
08/13/2010RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 10-19264
08/13/2010Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/20/2010RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 17, 2010. 10-19264