Case Information: 53561 | |||
Short Caption: | COLE VS. CIT GROUP | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A566339 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 11/10/2009 | How Submitted: | |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/07/2009 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Don G. Cole check no. 330. | ||
04/07/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) | 09-08734 | |
04/21/2009 | Other | Returned Mail. Rec for Docs 4/7/09 and Civil Appeals Pilot Program packet addressed to Pite Duncan/Las Vegas. Per USPS "attempted, not known". Per phone call to Pite Duncan/San Diego, they stated there was no LV office and that Laurel Handley is at the San Diego address. Updated Pite Duncan/Laurel Handley address and remailed all documents. | 09-09933 | |
05/20/2009 | Brief | Filed Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | 09-12531 | |
08/24/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Directing Appellant to Properly Serve the Notice of Appeal. Certificate of Service due: 20 days. | 09-20503 | |
09/08/2009 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. Response to Court Order Directing Appellant to Properly Serve the Notice of Appeal. | 09-21756 | |
09/11/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Directing Transmission of Record and Directing Response. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. Respondent's Response due: 60 days. | 09-22099 | |
09/29/2009 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. | 09-23781 | |
11/10/2009 | Brief | Filed Response to Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | 09-27487 | |
11/10/2009 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
12/09/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." | 10-32178 | |
01/04/2011 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 11-00226 | |
01/04/2011 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
01/21/2011 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on January 11, 2011. | 11-00226 |