Case Information: 53548 | |||
Short Caption: | CLARK VS. COMMONWEALTH LAND & TITLE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 58176 , 59751 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A551397 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 04/10/2009 / Saint-Aubin, Robert | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/06/2009 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Gerard and Associates check no. 1084. | ||
04/06/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 09-08563 | |
04/06/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days | 09-08565 | |
04/06/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Letter. to attorney Robert Gerard, returning the original "Notice of Appeal" that he submitted to this court. | 09-08568 | |
04/10/2009 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Robert F. Saint-Aubin | 09-09008 | |
05/05/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Docketing Statement. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) Due Date: 10 days | 09-11143 | |
05/27/2009 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. The premediation conference has not been conducted because appellant requests the opportunity to perfect the filing before proceeding with the settlement conference. | 09-13159 | |
08/10/2009 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. | 09-19503 | |
08/10/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion to Dismiss Appeal. | 09-19512 | |
08/14/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Voluntary Dismissal. Pursuant to appellant's motion for voluntary dismissal, "this appeal is dismissed." NRAP 42(b). CLK- NNP-TH | 09-19867 | |
08/14/2009 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |