Case Information: 53557 | |||
Short Caption: | CODDINGTON VS. DONAT | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Carson City - First Judicial District - 07OC014731B | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 09/15/2009 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/06/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
04/06/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) | 09-08639 | |
04/08/2009 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion. Notice of Motion and Motion for Sanctions/Other Relief. | 09-08770 | |
05/19/2009 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion. Motion for Enlargement of Time (First Request) Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | 09-12427 | |
05/20/2009 | Brief | Filed Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | 09-12507 | |
08/20/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Requesting Transmission of Record and Denying Motions. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. We deny as moot appellant's motion for an enlargement of time. We deny apppellant's April 8, 2009, motion. | 09-20266 | |
08/31/2009 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance. Notice of Change of Attorney. Representing respondent: Micoh Martin, Deputy Attorney General. | 09-21093 | |
09/15/2009 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1-2. | 09-22333 | |
09/15/2009 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
12/04/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP09-MC/NS/MG | 09-29465 | |
12/29/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-30390 | |
12/29/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
12/29/2009 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. of change of attorney. Robert Simon, Deputy A.G. in place of Michon Martin. | 09-31462 | |
01/11/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 30, 2009. | 09-30390 |