Case Information: 53534 | |||
Short Caption: | BELL (CORDALE) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 62304 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR071778 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 01/26/2010 | How Submitted: | |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/03/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 09-08414 | |
04/03/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
04/16/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. of Limited Remand for Appointment of Counsel. District court order due: 35 days. | 09-09590 | |
05/15/2009 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on May 13, 2009. Recommendation and Order Appointing Counsel. (Glynn Cartledge appointed as counsel for appellant). | 09-12166 | |
05/15/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Appointed Counsel. Docketing statement due: 15 days. Request for transcripts: 15 days. Opening brief: 120 days. (Docketing statement form mailed to counsel). | 09-12167 | |
06/05/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion. | 09-14168 | |
06/18/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion to Withdraw as Counsel and Remanding for Appointment of Counsel. District Court Order due: 35 days. The time periods for filing the transcript request form, docketing statement, opening brief and appendix shall be suspended pending further order of this court. | 09-15145 | |
07/17/2009 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on July 14, 2009. Recommendation and Order Appointing Counsel. (Mary Lou Wilson appointed as counsel for appellant). | 09-17630 | |
07/17/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Appointed Counsel. Docketing statement due: 15 days. Request for transcripts: 15 days. Opening brief: 120 days. (Docketing statement form mailed to counsel). | 09-17631 | |
07/22/2009 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 09-17985 | |
07/27/2009 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | 09-18252 | |
10/07/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion. Request for Sealing of Presentence Investigation Report in Support of Appellant Opening Brief (SEALED DOCUMENT). ((DETACHED Presentence InvestigationReport AND FILED PER ORDER 10/09/09). | 09-24499 | |
10/07/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion. Request for Sealing of Lakes Crossing Evaluations in Support of Appellant Opening Brief (SEALED DOCUMENT). (DETACHED Compentency Evaluations AND FILED PER ORDER 10/09/09). | 09-24501 | |
10/07/2009 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 09-24502 | |
10/07/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 and 2. | 09-24503 | |
10/09/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motions. The clerk of this court shall file the documents attached to the motions under seal. | 09-24768 | |
10/09/2009 | Other | Other. Filed - SEALED - Presentence Investigaton Report. | 09-24771 | |
10/09/2009 | Other | Other. Filed - SEALED - Compentency Evaluations. | 09-24773 | |
10/13/2009 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 09-24949 | |
11/30/2009 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed. No reply brief filed. | ||
01/26/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. | 10-02089 | |
01/26/2010 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
03/10/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP10-JH/MD/KP. | 10-06327 | |
04/07/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-07095 | |
04/07/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
04/13/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 9, 2010. | 10-07095 |