judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MATTHEWS, JR. (FELTON) VS. STATE

Case Information: 53552
Short Caption:MATTHEWS, JR. (FELTON) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 38225 , 38307 , 38379 , 38380 , 39014 , 39717 , 39837 , 39885 , 40033 , 40299 , 40468 , 40568 , 40605 , 40709 , 40902 , 41149 , 41204 , 41483 , 41557 , 43380 , 43405 , 43742 , 43822 , 44343 , 46338 , 46475 , 46551 , 46868 , 47145 , 47339 , 49757 , 50871 , 56441 , 59017 , 59247 , 61018 , 67854 , 67854-COA , 70855 , 70855-COA , 80068
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C174537 Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:07/06/2009How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/06/2009Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 09-08604
04/06/2009Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
04/09/2009Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. 09-08965
04/16/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 90 days. 09-09576
07/06/2009Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 9. 09-16432
07/06/2009Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
10/21/2009Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP09-MC/NS/MG fn3[We have reviewed all documents that appellant has submitted in proper person to the clerk of this court in this matter, and we conclude that no relief based upon those submissions is warranted.] 09-25658
11/17/2009RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 09-27780
11/17/2009Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/25/2009RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 20, 2009. 09-27780