Case Information: 53551 | |||
Short Caption: | JAMES (JERRY) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C234689 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 06/02/2009 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/06/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 09-08602 | |
04/06/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
04/16/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order re: Transmit Judgment or Order and Record on Appeal. Order due: 30 days. Record on appeal due: 60 days. | 09-09584 | |
04/27/2009 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on April 22, 2009. (Order Denying Defendant's Proper Person Motion to Amend Judgment of Conviction.) | 09-10407 | |
06/02/2009 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. | 09-13667 | |
06/02/2009 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
06/11/2009 | Other | Returned Mail. Rec for Docs 6/2/09 addressed to Jerry S. James. Per NDOC and stamp on envelope, Mr. James has been paroled. No forwarding address. | 09-14537 | |
09/10/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP09-RP/MD/KP | 09-21925 | |
09/24/2009 | Other | Returned Mail. Order filed 9/10/09 addressed to Jerry S. James. Per NDOC, Mr. James has been paroled. No forwarding address. | 09-23198 | |
10/06/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-22875 | |
10/06/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
10/15/2009 | Other | Returned Mail. Remittitur issued 10/6/09 addressed to Jerry S. James. Per NDOC, Mr. James has been paroled. No forwarding address. | 09-25123 | |
10/16/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 12, 2009. | 09-22875 |