judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KWIST VS. CHANG

Case Information: 53545
Short Caption:KWIST VS. CHANGCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A539742Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:04/10/2009 / Saint-Aubin, RobertSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/11/2011How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/06/2009Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Ralph L. Denton check no. 1049.
04/06/2009Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) 09-08541
04/06/2009Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days 09-08543
04/10/2009Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Robert F. Saint-Aubin 09-09007
04/17/2009Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. 09-09692
04/17/2009Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. Case Appeal Statement. 09-09694
04/23/2009Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 09-10114
04/23/2009Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. Docketing Statement. 09-10115
04/29/2009Docketing StatementFiled Response to Docketing Statement. 09-10656
05/01/2009Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. - Case Appeal Statement served on Settlement Judge. 09-10918
05/06/2009Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Docketing Statement on Settlement Judge. 09-11230
05/27/2009Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 6/4/09 09-13157
06/15/2009Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued. The parties are reevaluating their positions. 09-14837
07/27/2009Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 09-18343
07/30/2009Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 15 days to request transcripts; 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. 09-18623
08/10/2009Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. Counsel have requested reopening of the settlement conference process as they make another attempt at settling the case. 09-19502
08/12/2009MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Motion to Dismiss Appeal with Prejudice and for Sanctions Pursuant to NRAP 38. 09-19620
08/12/2009Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. -Motion to Dismiss Appeal with Prejudice and For Sanctions Pursuant to NRAP 38. 09-19622
08/17/2009MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 09-19993
08/19/2009Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Motion to Extend Time Served on the Settlement Judge. 09-20178
08/20/2009Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Affidavit of Mailing. Motion to Dismiss Appeal with Prejudice and For Sanctions Pursuant to NRAP 38 on Settlement Judge. 09-20248
11/02/2009Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 09-26665
11/04/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Concluding Settlement Proceedings and Granting Motion. Briefing and compliance with NRAP 9(a) suspended pending resolution of respondent's motion to dismiss. We grant appellant's motion for extension of time to file a response to respondent's motion to dismiss. Appellant: Response due 10 days. 09-27001
11/16/2009MotionFiled Response to Motion. Points and Authorities in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss 09-27928
12/10/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Denying Motion to Dismiss and for Sanctions and Order Reinstating Briefing. Transcript Request Form due: 15 days. Opening Brief and Appendix due: 90 days. 09-29915
12/17/2009Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 09-30663
03/03/2010MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion to Enlarge Time to File Opening Brief. (30) days. 10-05616
03/03/2010MotionFiled Stipulation. Stipulation to Enlarge Time in Which to File Opening Brief. (30) days. 10-05618
03/03/2010Notice/OutgoingFiled Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief due date: April 9, 2010. 10-05627
04/12/2010BriefFiled Opening Brief. 10-09471
04/14/2010AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 10-09698
05/18/2010AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 10-12825
05/18/2010MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion to Enlarge Time to File Respondent's Answering Brief. (7) days. 10-12849
05/18/2010BriefReceived Answering Brief. Via E-Flex. FILED PER ORDER OF 5/25/10.
05/25/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. for extension of time to file Answering Brief. The clerk of this court shall file the answering brief, provisionally received in this court on May 18, 2010. 10-13602
05/25/2010BriefFiled Answering Brief. 10-13603
06/28/2010BriefFiled Reply Brief. 10-16858
02/11/2011Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Northern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 11-04605
03/31/2011Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." 11-09713
04/11/2011MotionFiled Motion to Reissue Order of Affirmance as an Opinion. 11-10701
04/25/2011RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 11-12125
04/25/2011Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
05/05/2011RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on April 29, 2011. 11-12125
07/27/2011Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion for Publication. 11-22611