Case Information: 53554 | |||
Short Caption: | MOOR (MARK) VS. WARDEN | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Carson City - First Judicial District - 09EW000091B | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 07/09/2009 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/06/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
04/06/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 09-08608 | |
04/16/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 90 days. | 09-09577 | |
07/09/2009 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. | 09-16944 | |
07/09/2009 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
11/03/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP09-MC/NS/MG | 09-26856 | |
12/01/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-28528 | |
12/01/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
12/09/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 2, 2009. | 09-28528 |