Case Information: 53563 | |||
Short Caption: | FUENTES (CRYSTAL) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 45221 , 45412 , 45611 , 47967 , 49232 , 65376 , 67193 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C204618 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 07/28/2009 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/07/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 09-08740 | |
04/07/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
04/13/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Due Date: 10 days (Findings of Fact filed on 3/11/09.) | 09-09302 | |
04/21/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of Findings of Fact Conclusions of Law and Order filed in district court on 3/11/09. | 09-09960 | |
05/05/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 90 days. | 09-11191 | |
07/28/2009 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 5. | 09-18389 | |
07/28/2009 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
11/24/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP09-RP/MD/KP | 09-28693 | |
12/22/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-29897 | |
12/22/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
01/11/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 29, 2009. | 09-29897 |