Case Information: 53562 | |||
Short Caption: | RODRIGUES (SERGIO) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 53343 , 57610 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - 07C232845 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/07/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 09-08738 | |
04/07/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
04/07/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days | 09-08739 | |
04/23/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Show Cause. Appellant's counsel David Lee Phillips shall have 15 days from the date of this order to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. | 09-10091 | |
05/08/2009 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. Reply to Order to Show Cause. | 09-11410 | |
05/20/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP09-MC/NS/MG | 09-12537 | |
06/16/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-13923 | |
06/16/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
06/22/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 18, 2009. | 09-13923 |