Case Information: 49675 | |||
Short Caption: | R & M REALTY VS. DIST. CT. (MORTON) | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A525825 | Classification: | Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/21/2007 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Bailey Merrill, LLP--check no. 11486. | ||
06/21/2007 | Petition/Writ | Filed Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. | 07-13634 | |
06/27/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Answer Writ Petition. The real parties in interest, on behalf of respondents, shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to file an answer, including authorities, against issuance of the requested writ. | 07-14015 | |
06/29/2007 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Notice of Filing Original Verification in Support of the Petition for Extraordinary Writ Relief. | 07-14328 | |
07/30/2007 | Petition/Writ | Filed Answer to Petition for Writ. Submitted by Todd L. Bice of Brownstein, Hyatt firm - counsel for real parties in interest Morton; Hard Rock Hotel; HR Condol and PM Realty. | 07-16664 | |
07/30/2007 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. to Answer to Petition for Writ. | 07-16665 | |
08/10/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion. Petitioner's Motion for Leave to File a Supplement to Petition for Extraordinary Writ Relief. DETACHED EXHIBIT 1 AND FILED. | 07-17707 | |
11/15/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. to File Supplement. The clerk of this court shall detach the supplement attached to the motion as Exhibit 1 and file it. | 07-24863 | |
11/15/2007 | Petition/Writ | Filed Supplement to Petition for Writ. Petitioner's Supplement to Petition for Extraordinary Writ Relief. | 07-24865 | |
01/15/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Denying Petition. "We deny the petition." SNP08-JH/RP/MD. | 08-01123 | |
02/11/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. | 08-02331 | |
02/11/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. |