Case Information: 53540 | |||
Short Caption: | MONUMENT CAPITAL VS. KEYBANK | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A557903 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 04/10/2009 / Saint-Aubin, Robert | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/03/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. | ||
04/03/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 09-08459 | |
04/03/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days | 09-08460 | |
04/08/2009 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Marquis & Aurbach. Check no. 094168. | ||
04/10/2009 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Robert F. Saint-Aubin | 09-09006 | |
04/20/2009 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 09-09808 | |
05/27/2009 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 6/3/09. | 09-13158 | |
06/15/2009 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued. The parties are exchanging/reviewing documentation that may be the basis for a resolution. | 09-14838 | |
09/09/2009 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | 09-21863 | |
09/14/2009 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 15 days to request transcripts; 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. | 09-22294 | |
09/29/2009 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 12/30/08 and 01/27/09. To Court Reporter: Jill Hawkins. | 09-23800 | |
11/18/2009 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance. Representing appellant: Micah Echols, Esq. | 09-28129 | |
11/18/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. (First Request). (30) days. | 09-28130 | |
11/18/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Filed Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief due date: January 14, 2010. | 09-28135 | |
01/07/2010 | Motion | Filed Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Stipulation to Dismiss Appeal With Prejudice. | 10-00546 | |
01/14/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. We approve the stipulation and "dismiss this appeal." NNP-HC. | 10-01242 | |
01/14/2010 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |