Case Information: 53539 | |||
Short Caption: | GAXIOLA (JOSE) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 40968 , 42258 , 47125 , 54468 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C179066 | Classification: | Original Proceeding - Criminal - Proper Person Writ Petition |
Disqualifications: | Douglas | Case Status: | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed |
Replacement: | Justice Hardesty for Justice Douglas | Panel Assigned: | Panel |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/03/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
04/03/2009 | Petition/Writ | Filed Proper Person Petition for Writ. Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. | 09-08448 | |
04/03/2009 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Douglas. Sat in district court proceedings. | ||
04/23/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Denying Petition. "ORDER the petition DENIED." SNP09-JH/RP/KP. | 09-10087 | |
05/19/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. | 09-11572 | |
05/19/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
06/04/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. On June 2, 2009, this court received a notice from petitioner indicating that he had filed a petition for a writ of habeas corpus in the district court. To the extent that petitioner seeks relief, this court denies the request. This matter is closed. The clerk of this court shall return, unfiled, any further documents received in this matter. | 09-14088 |