Case Information: 53538 | |||
Short Caption: | BARNETT (JON) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Lincoln Co. - Seventh Judicial District - CR0205003 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/03/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
04/03/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 09-08445 | |
04/07/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Rough Draft Transcript Request. Due date: 10 days. | 09-08705 | |
04/07/2009 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 1/23/09, 3/13/09. Court Reporter: None listed. Filed in district court on: 3/31/09. | 09-08716 | |
04/09/2009 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Teresa Seevers stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: None listed. | 09-08986 | |
04/09/2009 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 1/23/09 and 3/20/09. Court Reporter: Teresa Seevers. | 09-08987 | |
05/15/2009 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: May 20, 2009. | 09-12111 | |
05/21/2009 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 09-12650 | |
05/21/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 09-12651 | |
06/02/2009 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. Fast Track Response | 09-13666 | |
10/21/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP09-MC/NS/MG | 09-25777 | |
11/17/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-27779 | |
11/17/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
11/25/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 19, 2009. | 09-27779 |