Case Information: 53537 | |||
Short Caption: | BIRCH (BRUCE) VS. STATE C/W 53535/53536 | Court: | Supreme Court |
Consolidated: | 53535 *, 53536 , 53537 | Related Case(s): | 56120 , 56352 , 56454 , 56538 , 58175 , 72758 , 72797 , 72797-COA , 77037 |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR071714 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/03/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) | 09-08441 | |
04/03/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
04/03/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days | 09-08442 | |
04/03/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Rough Draft Transcript Request. Due date: 10 days. | 09-08443 | |
04/13/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Minutes. | 09-09256 | |
04/14/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. | 09-09362 | |
04/14/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. | 09-09412 | |
04/16/2009 | Other | Returned Mail. Rec for Docs 4/3/09, Notice to File CAS 4/3/09, Notice to File Request for Rough Draft Transcripts 4/3/09, addressed to Bruce H. Birch. Updated address per NDOC. Remailed documents to new address. | 09-09558 | |
04/16/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Case Appeal Statement. (Submitted by district court) | 09-09668 | |
04/27/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion and Remanding for Counsel. The clerk of this court shall file the proper person motion received on April 20, 2009. The clerk of this cour shall remove Mr. Lindsay as counsel of record in this appeal. We remand this appeal to the district court for the limited purpose of securing appellate counsel for appellant. Distirct court order due 30 days. Briefing suspended. | 09-10311 | |
04/27/2009 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion. to remove Robert Linday as counsel of record and re-appoint appellate counsel due to conflict of interest. | 09-09892 | |
05/11/2009 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. | 09-11669 | |
05/11/2009 | Other | Returned Mail. Order filed 4/27/09 addressed to Bruce H. Birch. Per USPS "unable to forward". Confirmed with NDOC that Mr. Birch's address is Ely State Prison. Order remailed to ESP. | 09-11669 | |
05/15/2009 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on May 13, 2009. Recommendation and Order Appointing Counsel. (Karla Butko appointed as counsel for appellant). | 09-12154 | |
05/19/2009 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance. Representing appellant: Karla K. Butko. | 09-12393 | |
05/22/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Denying Motion and Reinstating Briefing. The clerk of this court shall file the proper person motion received on May 12, 2009. We deny the motion. We reinstate the briefing of this appeal. Butko: 10 days to file proof of service of a rough draft transcript request. 50 days to file the fast track statement and appendix. | 09-12825 | |
05/22/2009 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion. Motion of the Record. | 09-11682 | |
06/01/2009 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | 09-13571 | |
06/26/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. On May 21, 2009, appellant submitted a proper person motion in these appeals seeking leave to file proper person documents. The clerk of this court shall file the proper person motion. We reinstated the briefing of these appeals. Because appellant is represented by Ms. Butko in these appeals, we deny the motion to file proper person documents. Nos. 53535/53536/53537. | 09-15877 | |
06/26/2009 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion. Permission and or Leave to File Documents in Proper Person. Nos. 53535/53536/53537. | 09-12720 | |
07/10/2009 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 09-17075 | |
07/10/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 09-17076 | |
07/27/2009 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Response due: August 6, 2009. | 09-18324 | |
08/05/2009 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 09-19036 | |
03/11/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. We elect to consolidate these appeals for disposition. "ORDER the judgments of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP10-JH/MD/KP Nos. 53535/53536/53537. | 10-06426 | |
04/05/2010 | Letter/Incoming | Received Proper Person Letter. addressing "two questions" to this court. Nos. 53535/53536/53537 (10-08751). | ||
04/07/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-07067 | |
04/07/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
04/13/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 9, 2010. | 10-07067 |