judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

OFELDT (JAMES) VS. WARDEN

Case Information: 49679
Short Caption:OFELDT (JAMES) VS. WARDENCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 46384 , 48336 , 55992 , 56822 , 59811 , 68322 , 68322-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR032701Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:10/12/2007How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/22/2007Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
06/22/2007Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 07-13754
07/13/2007Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. 07-15294
07/20/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 90 days. 07-15883
10/12/2007Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. 07-22613
10/12/2007Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
02/13/2008Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP08-JH/RP/MD. fn 6[We have reviewed all documents that appellant has submitted in proper person to the clerk of this court in this matter, and we conclude that no relief based upon those submissions is warranted. To the extent that appellant has attempted to present claims or facts in those submissions which were not previously presented in the proceedings below, we have declined to consider them in the first instance.] 08-03549
03/11/2008RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 08-05027
03/11/2008Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/19/2008RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 13, 2008. 08-05027