judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ESTATE OF THOMPSON VS. BRACKENBURY

Case Information: 49680
Short Caption:ESTATE OF THOMPSON VS. BRACKENBURYCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Lincoln Co. - Seventh Judicial District - CV1156005Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:06/28/2007 / Worrell, CarolynSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:12/22/2008How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/22/2007Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Hutchison & Steffen, Ltd.--check no. 11789.
06/22/2007Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) 07-13757
06/28/2007Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Carolyn Worrell. 07-14168
07/10/2007Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 07-15036
07/16/2007Notice/IncomingFiled Substitution of Attorneys. Notice of Substitution of Counsel for Respondents. Beau Sterling have substituted in place of Gregory Barlow LTD PC as counsel for respondents in this appeal. 07-15425
08/20/2007Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled. 07-18308
01/18/2008Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Final Settlement Report. 08-01549
01/25/2008Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: February 8, 2008. Settlement Judge also requests an extension to March 30, 2008. 08-02017
02/08/2008Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. Appeal shall remain in the settlement conference program. Final settlement conference statue due by 3/31/08. 08-03090
02/14/2008Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: February 22, 2008. 08-03690
02/25/2008Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 08-04539
03/04/2008Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Order of 2/24/06. Due Date: 10 days. 08-05341
03/11/2008Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of Order Amending Complaint by Joining the Estate of Lom Thompson as a Party Defendant/Counterclaimant filed in district court on February 24, 2006. 08-06014
03/18/2008Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 15 days to request transcripts; 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. 08-06509
03/20/2008Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Modification of Caption. Parties are advised to notify this office in writing within 10 days if the caption as modified does not accurately reflect the status of the parties. 08-06863
03/25/2008Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. of Lis Pendens. 08-07229
04/11/2008Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Transcript Request. Due Date: 10 days 08-09119
04/21/2008Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 08-09881
06/16/2008MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: July 16, 2008. 08-15264
07/11/2008BriefFiled Opening Brief. 08-17792
07/11/2008AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 08-17795
08/14/2008MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: September 11, 2008. 08-21008
09/17/2008MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Second Request. 08-23988
09/26/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Respondents shall have until October 13, 2008, to file and serve the answering brief. No further extensions of time shall be permitted absent demonstration of extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. Counsel's caseload will not be deemed such a circumstance. 08-24944
10/07/2008MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Third Request 08-25892
10/23/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motion. Answering Brief due: November 10, 2008. 08-27273
11/12/2008BriefFiled Answering Brief. 08-28812
12/02/2008BriefFiled Reply Brief. 08-30544
12/22/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Oral argument will not be scheduled in this appeal, and it shall stand submitted on the record and the briefs filed herein, as of the date of this order. 08-32452
12/22/2008Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
05/21/2009Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Reversal and Remand. "ORDER the judgment of the district court REVERSED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." NNP09-MC/NS/MG 09-12620
06/16/2009RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 09-13956
06/16/2009Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/22/2009RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 18, 2009. 09-13956