Case Information: 53542 | |||
Short Caption: | TRI DELTA, INC. VS. LAND DEV., INC. | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A541308 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 04/10/2009 / Tanksley, Thomas | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 07/14/2010 | How Submitted: | |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/03/2009 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Pezzillo Robinson check no. 3967. | ||
04/03/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 09-08476 | |
04/10/2009 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Thomas J. Tanksley | 09-09003 | |
04/22/2009 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 09-10010 | |
04/22/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. Docketing Statement. | 09-10011 | |
04/29/2009 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. (Docketing Statement on Settlement Judge Thomas J. Tanksley.) | 09-10671 | |
05/27/2009 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 6/30/09 | 09-13138 | |
07/13/2009 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | 09-17178 | |
07/16/2009 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 15 days to request transcripts; 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. | 09-17535 | |
07/20/2009 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 2/03/09. To Court Reporter: Jessica Ramirez. | 09-17673 | |
08/10/2009 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Jessica Ramirez stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: no date given. | 09-19422 | |
10/16/2009 | Motion | Filed Stipulation and Order. Brief due: November 13, 2009. | 09-25240 | |
11/17/2009 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 09-28005 | |
11/17/2009 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vols. 1 through 9. | 09-28007 | |
11/17/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Opening Brief. Due date: 10 days. | 09-28010 | |
11/24/2009 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. - Opening Brief and Joint Appendix. | 09-28654 | |
12/01/2009 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance. Representing respondent: Tami D. Cowden, Esq./Greenberg Traurig. | 09-29055 | |
12/14/2009 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. Answering Brief of Respondent Land Development, Inc. | 09-30227 | |
12/14/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief. Supplemental Appendix to Respondent Land Development, Inc.'s Answering Brief | 09-30229 | |
01/21/2010 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | 10-01707 | |
01/27/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Strike. Motion to Strike Reply Brief. | 10-02223 | |
02/16/2010 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Opposition to Motion to Strike Reply Brief. | 10-04053 | |
02/19/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Denying Motion to Strike Reply Brief. | 10-04611 | |
07/14/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. | 10-18001 | |
07/14/2010 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
09/17/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." | 10-23947 | |
10/12/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-26627 | |
10/12/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
11/03/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on October 20, 2010. | 10-26627 |