Case Information: 53541 | |||
Short Caption: | MARKLE VS. MARKLE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D335713 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 04/13/2009 / Gaston, Robert | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/03/2009 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from The Law offices of Steven M. Altig cashiers check 003005275. | ||
04/03/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 09-08468 | |
04/03/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days | 09-08469 | |
04/13/2009 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Robert E. Gaston | 09-09101 | |
05/05/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Docketing Statement. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) Due Date: 10 days | 09-11137 | |
05/15/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Notice of Withdrawal of Appeal. | 09-12071 | |
05/15/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. On all parties including Settlement Judge. Due date: 10 days. | 09-12075 | |
05/19/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Voluntary Dismissal. Pursuant to appellant's motion for a voluntary dismissal "This appeal is dismissed." NRAP 42(b). CLK- SNP-TH | 09-12456 | |
05/19/2009 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |