Case Information: 49657 | |||
Short Caption: | RAMIREZ (ARMANDO) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 49002 , 54418 , 56199 , 73480 , 73480-COA , 79889 , 79889-COA | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C206238 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 04/25/2008 | How Submitted: | On Briefs |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/19/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
06/19/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 07-13335 | |
07/02/2007 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 11/15/04, 11/24/04, 01/07/05, 05/17/05, 06/27/05, 09/13/05, 09/26/05, 10/10/05, 10/18/05, 11/01/05, 11/04/05, 11/14/05, 11/16/05, 01/03/06, 01/06/06, 02/21/06, 04/18/06, 06/26/06, 06/29/06, 10/26/06, 01/25/07, 01/29/07, 01/30/07, 01/31/07, 02/01/07, 02/02/07, 04/03/07, and 04/10/07. To Court Reporter: Peggy Isom, Diann Prock, Renee Silvaggio, Renee Vincent, Jackie Nelson, Bill Nelson, and Lee Bahr. | 07-14456 | |
07/06/2007 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 10/26/06. Court Reporter: Renee Vincent. | 07-14745 | |
07/09/2007 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 07-14934 | |
07/11/2007 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 04/18/06, 06/26/06, 06/29/06. Court Reporter: Renee Silvaggio. | 07-15077 | |
07/11/2007 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 11/24/04. Court Reporter: Diann Prock. | 07-15105 | |
08/16/2007 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 01/25/07, 01/29/07, 01/30/07, 01/31/07, 02/01/07, and 02/02/07. Court Reporter: Jackie Nelson. | 07-18132 | |
08/20/2007 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Peggy Isom stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. | 07-18366 | |
08/24/2007 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Notice of Filing of Statement of the Evidence and Proceedings of February 21, 2006 (related to NRAP 9(d).) | 07-18815 | |
10/16/2007 | Motion | Filed Stipulation and Order. Brief due: November 16, 2007. | 07-22835 | |
11/14/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Ms. Bahr shall have 20 days from the date of this order to prepare the requested transcript and to file in this court a certificate of delivery of the transcripts. Appellant shall have 50 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. | 07-24845 | |
11/20/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Respondent having filed no response to appellant's statement, appellant is not required to submit the statement to the district court for approval and settlement. If appellant intends to rely upon or cite to the statement of evidence in his opening brief, he shall include a copy of the statement in his appendix. | 07-25276 | |
11/29/2007 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 04/03/07 and 04/10/07. Court Reporter: Lee Bahr. | 07-25809 | |
01/07/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 08-00401 | |
01/16/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: 2/4/08. | 08-01271 | |
02/06/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion to Transmit Exhibit for Court's Consideration. (Detached transcript and filed it separately per order filed on 02/22/08). | 08-02956 | |
02/06/2008 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 08-02957 | |
02/06/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 through 3. | 08-02960 | |
02/22/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. . Appellant's motion to transmit Exhibit 70 (DVD of the video depositon of James Daniel Ross) is denied. Attached to appellant's motion is the transcript of the video deposition. The clerk shall detach the copy of the transcript attached appellant's motion and file it separately for the court's consideration in this appeal. | 08-04379 | |
02/22/2008 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: Video Deposition of: James Daniel Ross. Court Reporter: Donna Fontaine. (Filed per order 02/22/08). | 08-04382 | |
03/07/2008 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 08-05849 | |
04/04/2008 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | 08-08510 | |
04/25/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. | 08-10314 | |
04/25/2008 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
10/17/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP08C-MC/WM/NS. | 08-26799 | |
11/12/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 08-27701 | |
11/12/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
11/25/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 17, 2008. | 08-27701 |