Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/20/2007 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Beckley Singleton-check no. 220332. | | |
06/20/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | | 07-13508 |
07/03/2007 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Stephen E. Haberfeld. | | 07-14557 |
07/09/2007 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | | 07-14941 |
07/09/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. Docketing Statement. | | 07-14942 |
07/13/2007 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. - Docketing Statement served on Settlement Judge. | | 07-15249 |
08/20/2007 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled. | | 07-18349 |
09/10/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. | | 07-19954 |
10/03/2007 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. Amended Docketing Statement. | | 07-21799 |
10/17/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. Second Amended Notice of Appeal. | | 07-22979 |
11/16/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Third Amended Notice of Appeal. | | 07-24947 |
12/10/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. Fourth Amended Notice of Appeal. | | 07-26757 |
12/24/2007 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | | 07-27866 |
01/02/2008 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. Second Amended Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. | | 08-00099 |
01/18/2008 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 15 days to request transcripts; 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. | | 08-01452 |
02/07/2008 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 3/05/07, 3/08/07, and 3/09/07. To Court Reporter: Patti Slattery/Gayle Pichierri. | | 08-03106 |
02/26/2008 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: March 8 and 9, 2007. Court Reporters: Richard Kangas and Patricia Slattery. | | 08-04633 |
04/21/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: May 16, 2008. | | 08-09880 |
05/19/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | | 08-12587 |
05/22/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Ms. Pichierri: 20 days to file the requested transcript. appellants have filed a motion requesting a second extension of time to file the opening brief and appendix. we grant the motion. Appellants: June 16, 2008, to file the opening brief and appendix. No further extensions of time shall be permitted absent demonstration of extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. Fn1 [A copy of the transcript request form is attached to this order.] | | 08-12897 |
06/09/2008 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 03/05/07. Court Reporter: Gayle Pichierri. | | 08-14526 |
06/19/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Motion by Appellants for Extension to File Opening Brief. (Third Request). | | 08-15730 |
06/25/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: July 15, 2008. | | 08-16260 |
07/18/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Motion by Appellants for Extension to File Opening Brief. (Fourth Request). | | 08-18529 |
07/21/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Extending Time. Opening Brief due: July 22, 2008. | | 08-18793 |
07/24/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols 1-11. | | 08-19156 |
07/25/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. Appendix to Appellants Opening Brief. | | 08-19265 |
07/25/2008 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | | 08-19267 |
07/28/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. (Delivered to Arin & Assoc.) Appendix to Appellant's Opening Brief. | | 08-19378 |
08/22/2008 | Motion | Filed Stipulation and Order. Brief due: 9/19/08. | | 08-21656 |
09/16/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | | 08-23890 |
09/26/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Extending Time. Respondents shall have until October 20, 2008, to file and serve the answering brief. No further extensions of time shall be permitted absent demonstration of extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. Counsel's caseload will not be deemed such a circumstance. | | 08-24948 |
09/29/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Consolidate. Appeal No. 48219 and Appeal No. 49672. Nos. 48219/49672. | | 08-25095 |
10/07/2008 | Motion | Filed Stipulation. Stipulation for Extension of Time to file and serve Respondent's Opposition to Appellants' Motion to Consolidate Appeal No. 49672 and 48219. | | 08-25854 |
10/20/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. (Second Request) | | 08-26904 |
10/28/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. the motion consolidate is denied as moot. The parties October 7, 2008, stipulation for an extension of time to file an opposition to the motion to consolidate is also denied as moot. Answering Brief due: November 3, 2008. | | 08-27585 |
11/04/2008 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | | 08-28132 |
12/09/2008 | Motion | Filed Stipulation and Order. Brief due: January 7, 2009. | | 08-31399 |
01/12/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. (30 days). | | 09-00826 |
01/28/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief. Reply Brief due: February 6, 2009. | | 09-02441 |
02/10/2009 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | | 09-03559 |
07/23/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Before the Northern Nevada Panel. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on October 27, 2009 at 10:30 a.m. NNP09-MC/NS/MG | | 09-18003 |
10/13/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | | 09-24941 |
10/16/2009 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Letter. Joint Letter Regarding Settlement. | | 09-25235 |
10/22/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Vacating Argument and Setting for Submission. This court elects to vacate the oral argument of this matter. The court hereby vacates oral argument presently scheduled for October 27, 2009, at 10:30 a.m. | | 09-25795 |
10/23/2009 | Motion | Filed Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Stipulation to Dismiss Appeal and Motion for Remand. | | 09-25927 |
11/10/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. We approve the parties stipulation and grant the motion, hereby "dismissing this appeal and remanding the matter to the district court." NNP09-JH. | | 09-27411 |
11/10/2009 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. | | |