judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RI, LLC VS. M ENTERTAINMENT, INC. C/W 49987

Case Information: 49670
Short Caption:RI, LLC VS. M ENTERTAINMENT, INC. C/W 49987Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:49670*, 49987 Related Case(s): 49987
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A471428Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:07/03/2007 / Reed, NathanielSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/20/2007Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Beckley Singleton--check no. 220336.
06/20/2007Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) 07-13506
07/03/2007Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Nathaniel J. Reed. 07-14548
07/09/2007Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 07-14944
07/09/2007Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. Docketing Statement. 07-14945
07/13/2007Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. - Docketing Statement served on Settlement Judge. 07-15248
08/16/2007Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled. 07-18081
08/31/2007MotionFiled Motion to Consolidate. Motion to Consolidate Appeals. Nos. 49670/49987. 07-19308
08/31/2007Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. 07-19309
09/07/2007Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Certificate of Service for Motion to Consolidate Appeals served upon Settlement Judge Reed. 07-19660
12/28/2007MotionFiled Stipulation. Stipulation to Extend Time for Filing Final Settlement Conference Report. 07-28155
12/31/2007Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have stipulated to extend the time an additional 90 days. Nos. 49670/49987-cases are not consolidated. 07-28329
01/24/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Consolidating Appeals and Extending Time to File the Final Settlement Status Report. We consolidate these appeals for all appellate purposes. These consolidated appeals shall remain in the settlement program for an additional 90 days. Statue report due: 3/31/08. Nos. 49670/49987. 08-01869
04/03/2008Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Final Settlement Report. 08-08351
04/03/2008Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. 49670 and 49987. The settlement judge requests an extension of 60 days to file a Final Status Report. 08-08390
06/12/2008MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Appellant requests an additional 60 days up to and including August 1, 2008, in which to complete and file a stipulation or motion to dismiss the appeal. 08-14895
07/21/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. 49670/49987. Order granting motion filed on docket No. 49670 requesting these consolidated appeals remain assigned to the settlement conference program pending finalization of the parties' settlement agreement. Parties: Stipulation or motion dismiss due 8/1/08. 08-18685
08/04/2008MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to July 21, 2008 Order. Nos. 49670/49987. 08-20403
08/05/2008Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. 49670 and 49987. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 08-20199
09/05/2008MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension to File Stipulation or Dismissal. (Appellant) 08-22901
09/26/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Grant appellant RI, LLC's motions to extend time to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss these consolidated appeals. Parties: 30 days to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss. Nos.49670/49987. 08-24949
10/27/2008MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Appellant requests up to and including 11/26/08 to file stipulation or motion to dismiss. 08-27514
10/30/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order Extending Time. We grant appellant RI, LLC's motion for extension of time to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss these consolidated appeals pursuant to the parties' settlement agreement. Appellant: 11/26/08 to file stipulation or motion to dismiss. Nos. 49670/49987 08-27897
12/02/2008MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Appellant requests additional time up to 1/26/09 to file a stipulation to dismiss. 08-30509
01/28/2009MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension to File Stipulation or Dismissal. Nos. 49670/49987 (09-02383). 09-02383
02/09/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order Extending Time. If the parties have reached a settlement agreement that requires action by the district court to effectuate, it may not be necessary to proceed under Huneycutt. If the agreement resolves this appeal the parties may file a stipulation to dismiss this appeal, which includes a request for this court to remand the matter to the district court. Parties: Until 2/25/09 to file stipulation to dismiss these consolidated appeals or to inform of status. Nos. 49670/49987 09-03439
02/27/2009MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension to File Stipulation of Dismissal. Nos. 49670/49987 (09-05132). 09-05132
03/30/2009MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension to File Stipulation or Dismissal. (additional 30 days up to and including April 27, 2009). Nos. 49670/49987. 09-07899
04/03/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Nos. 49670/49987. We grant LLC's motion. The parties have until 4/27/09 to file a stipulation to dismiss these consolidated appeals. 09-08474
05/01/2009MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension to File Stipulation or Dismissal. Nos. 49670/49987. 09-10862
05/08/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. 49670/49987. Grant RI's motion for extension of time up to 5/27/09 for stip to dismiss. No further extensions will be granted. If stip to dismiss not filed by 5/27/09, this matter shall proceed to briefing. 09-11501
06/18/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Concluding Settlement Proceedings and Reinstating Briefing. Parties: 10 days to file transcript request forms. Appellant RI: 70 days to file opening brief & Appendix in Docket No. 49670. fn1[R&M is only a respondent in Docket No. 49670 and not a party in docket No. 49987. The only answering brief portion of that combined brief will apply to R&M. M Entertainment, Saxe and R&M are represented by the same counsel.] 49670/49987 09-15279
07/06/2009MotionFiled Stipulation. Stipulation to Dismiss Appeals and Motion to Remand. Nos. 49670/49987. 09-16450
07/07/2009Notice/IncomingFiled Errata. Errata to Stipulation to Dismiss Appeals and Motion to Remand. Nos. 49670/49987. 09-16630
07/07/2009Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 1/10/07, 1/22/07, 4/16/07, 4/17/07, and 4/19/07. To Court Reporter: None listed. (Appellants). Nos. 49670/49987 (09-16652). 09-16652
07/22/2009Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. "We approve the parties' stipulation and grant the motion, hereby dismissing these appeals and remanding these matters to the district court." The appeals' dismissal is without prejudice to appellants' right to file a motion to reinstate these appeals should the distirct court decline to grant the requested relief. NNP-JH Nos. 49670/49987. 09-17886
07/22/2009Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.