judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PARKER VS. DIV. OF INDUSTRIAL RELATIONS

Case Information: 49655
Short Caption:PARKER VS. DIV. OF INDUSTRIAL RELATIONSCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A517752
Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A538897
Classification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:06/29/2007 / Trost, JanetSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/19/2007Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Kemp & Kemp--check no. 3011.
06/19/2007Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) 07-13331
06/19/2007Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days 07-13337
06/25/2007Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. 07-13863
06/29/2007Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Janet Trost. 07-14247
07/05/2007Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from attorney J. Michael McGroarty notifying the court of law firm name change and address change. 07-14679
07/09/2007Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 07-14943
07/09/2007Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. of Errata (additional documents left out of docketing statement). 07-14971
07/30/2007Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled. 07-16667
08/07/2007Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: August 28, 2007. 07-17284
09/10/2007Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: September 24, 2007. 07-19877
09/24/2007Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address. Kemp & Kemp 07-21030
10/01/2007Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: October 3, 2007. 07-21609
10/11/2007Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: November 15, 2007. 07-22474
11/28/2007Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: November 21, 2007. 07-25599
11/28/2007Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: November 29, 2007. 07-25600
12/03/2007Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: December 4, 2007. 07-26009
12/11/2007Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: December 21, 2007. 07-26853
12/24/2007Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: December 26, 2007. Settlement Judge recommends a 90-day extension. 07-27858
12/31/2007Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: January 7, 2008. 07-28324
01/15/2008Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: February 1, 2008. 08-01057
02/04/2008Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: March 7, 2008. 08-02802
02/08/2008Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. The settlement judge shall file the final settlement conference report by March 25, 2008. 08-03273
03/24/2008Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The Settlement Judge requests a 90-day extension in an attempt to settle this case. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: 4/2/08. 08-07154
05/05/2008Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: 5/7/08 08-11106
05/13/2008Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 08-11883
05/13/2008MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Pursuant to Settlement Conference. 08-11885
06/27/2008Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). CLK-TH [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] 08-16472
06/27/2008Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.