Case Information: 49654 | |||
Short Caption: | HOWELL (DAVID) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 43625 , 46746 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR040197 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction |
Disqualifications: | Hardesty | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/19/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
06/19/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 07-13329 | |
06/19/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Justice Disqualification. Justice James W. Hardesty sat in district court proceedings. | 07-13330 | |
07/24/2007 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 07-16164 | |
07/24/2007 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 07-16166 | |
08/14/2007 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 07-17917 | |
12/10/2007 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP-MG/MC/NS | 07-26655 | |
01/04/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 08-00063 | |
01/04/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
01/09/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 7, 2008. | 08-00063 |