Case Information: 53553 | |||
Short Caption: | CALDWELL (WILLIAM) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 35815 , 38068 , 43054 , 44373 , 53000 , 56471 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C151547 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/06/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 09-08605 | |
04/06/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
04/23/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." SNP09-RP/MD/KP. | 09-10098 | |
05/19/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-11569 | |
05/19/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
05/28/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 22, 2009. | 09-11569 |