judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GRISHAM VS. GRISHAM

Case Information: 53543
Short Caption:GRISHAM VS. GRISHAMCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 52667 , 55281 , 55394 , 57433 , 59102
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D368513Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:09/02/2009How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/03/2009Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Michael Grisham check no. 2285.
04/03/2009Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) 09-08482
04/20/2009Transcript RequestFiled Civil Proper Person Transcript Request Form. 09-09827
05/13/2009BriefFiled Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. 09-11878
05/13/2009Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Civil Proper Person Appeal Transcripts. 09-11879
05/13/2009TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 2/9/07, 2/15/08, 3/28/08, 5/19/08, 9/30/08, 10/17/08, 3/10/09, 4/17/09. Court Reporter: Shelly Ajoub/Transcript Video Services. (Not Certified) 09-11880
05/13/2009TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Shelly Ajoub/Transcript Video Services stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 2/9/07, 2/15/08, 3/28/08, 5/19/08, 9/30/08, 10/17/08, 3/10/09, 4/17/09. (Submitted by Appellant) 09-11887
05/14/2009TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Shelly Ajoub/Transcript Video Services stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 2/9/07, 2/15/08, 3/28/08, 5/19/08, 9/30/08, 10/17/08, 3/10/09, 4/17/09. (Submitted by District Court) 09-12000
05/20/2009MotionFiled Motion. to Dismiss the Law Office of Webster & Associates from Appellant's Appeal or in the Alternative for Clarification. 09-12514
05/28/2009MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Appellant's Response and Counter Motion to Motion to Dismiss the Law Office of Webster & Associates from Appellant's Appeal or in the Alternative for Clarification. 09-13263
07/01/2009Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. 09-16264
07/13/2009MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Motion for an Un-Altered, Un-Edited Verbatim Transcript of the Proceedings or in the Alternative a Motion for Relief From Judgment and Order. 09-17231
08/11/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Directing Transmission of Record and Directing Service of Notice of Appeal. Record in case no. D368513 due 30 days. Appellant: 20 days to file a certificate of service for the notice of appeal. Fn1 [We defer ruling on appellant's motions.] 09-19535
08/17/2009Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Appellant's Response to Order Directing Transmission of Record and Directing Service of Notice of Appeal. (In response to order filed 8/11/09). 09-19945
08/28/2009MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Emergency Petiton for Stay of the Property Settlement Agreement. 09-21005
08/28/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Temporary Stay. Respondent shall have 10 days from the date of this order within which to file any opposition to appellant's motion for a stay. fn1[We defer ruling on appellant's May 20, May 28, and July 13, 2009, motions.] 09-21066
09/01/2009MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Respondent's Opposition To Appellant's Petition For A Stay Of Property Settlement Agreement. 09-21298
09/02/2009Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 7. 09-21380
09/02/2009Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
09/04/2009Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Order Granting Tempory Stay. 09-21654
09/10/2009MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Appellant's Reply to Respondent's Opposition to Appellant's Petition for a Stay of Property Settlement Agreement. 09-21933
09/18/2009Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Non-Payment for Appeal Transcripts. 09-22704
09/22/2009Notice/IncomingFiled Errata. Errata - Line 10 and 10.5 Only - Notice of Non-Payment for Appeal Transcripts. 09-22999
10/08/2009Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP09-MC/MD/MG fn2[In light of this order, we deny as moot all pending motions in this court and we vacate the temporary stay imposed by our August 28, 2009, order.] 09-24619
11/03/2009RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 09-26418
11/03/2009Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/18/2009RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 9, 2009. 09-26418
12/30/2009TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Tammy Gonzales stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 11/24/09. 09-31548
04/10/2012MotionFiled Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record for Respondent. 12-11415
04/13/2012Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record for Respondent. 12-11959
04/19/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Regarding Notice Withdrawing Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. In light of the notice withdrawing the motion, and since this case is closed and the remittitur issued, no action will be taken on counsel's April 10 motion. 12-12626