Case Information: 51504 | |||
Short Caption: | JACKSON (PATRICK) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C222535 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 07/07/2008 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/28/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
04/28/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 08-10544 | |
05/15/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 90 days. [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] | 08-12219 | |
07/07/2008 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. | 08-17183 | |
07/07/2008 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
04/16/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Directing Transmission of Supplemental Record on Appeal. Due: 40 days. | 09-09566 | |
04/28/2009 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Maureen Schorn stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 11/29/06. | 09-10477 | |
06/19/2009 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Letter. from District Court Clerk. | 09-15363 | |
06/23/2009 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Vol 2. (Supplemental) | 09-15565 | |
07/01/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Directing Transmission of Supplemental Record on Appeal (transcript of June 7, 2006). Fn2 [On June 23, 2009, this court received a supplemental record on appeal containing the transcripts for the hearings on October 11, 2006 and November 29, 2006. Accordingly, no further action concerning those transcripts is required from Joe D'Amato or Maureen Schorn.] | 09-16289 | |
08/04/2009 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 6/7/06. Court Reporter: Kiara Schmidt. (submitted by Cheryl Carpenter/Court Transcriber). (In response to Order filed 7/1/09) | 09-18971 | |
08/06/2009 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Vol. 3. | 09-19219 | |
09/03/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP09-MC/NS/MG. | 09-21481 | |
10/21/2009 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40(c). | 09-25643 | |
11/17/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-27691 | |
11/17/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
11/25/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 20, 2009. | 09-27691 |