Case Information: 51525 | |||
Short Caption: | SULLIVAN (KEITH) VS. STATE C/W 51523/51524 | Court: | Supreme Court |
Consolidated: | 51523 *, 51524 , 51525 | Related Case(s): | 48007 |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR061330 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/01/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
05/01/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 08-10917 | |
05/06/2008 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. Notice of Transcript Request. | 08-11255 | |
05/07/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. | 08-11333 | |
05/13/2008 | Motion | Filed Stipulation. Stipulation to Consolidate Appeals. Nos.51523/51524/51525. | 08-11923 | |
05/21/2008 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. Nos.51523/51524/51525. | 08-12790 | |
05/21/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Nos.51523/51524/51525. | 08-12792 | |
06/03/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Consolidation. We approve the stipulation and consolidate these appeals for all appellate purposes. Nos. 51523/51524/51525 (08-13934). [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] | ||
06/18/2008 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Response due: June 20, 2008. [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] Nos. 51523/51524/51525 (08-15552). | ||
06/19/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Nos. 51523/51524/51525. (08-15683) | ||
06/26/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion. Fast Track Response due: July 17, 2008. Nos. 51523/51524/51525 (08-16280). | ||
07/16/2008 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. Nos. 51523/51524/51525 (08-18300). | ||
04/21/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Nos. 51523/51524/51525. SNP09-RP/MD/KP. | 09-09943 | |
05/19/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-11579 | |
05/19/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
05/22/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 21, 2009. | 09-11579 |