judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SULLIVAN (KEITH) VS. STATE C/W 51523/51525

Case Information: 51524
Short Caption:SULLIVAN (KEITH) VS. STATE C/W 51523/51525Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated: 51523 *, 51524, 51525 Related Case(s): 48008
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR061410Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/01/2008Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
05/01/2008Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 08-10914
05/06/2008Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. Notice of Transcript Request. 08-11254
05/07/2008Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. 08-11326
05/13/2008MotionFiled Stipulation. Stipulation to Consolidate Appeals. Nos.51523/51524/51525. 08-11922
05/21/2008Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. Nos.51523/51524/51525. 08-12784
05/21/2008AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Nos.51523/51524/51525. 08-12785
06/03/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Consolidation. We approve the stipulation and consolidate these appeals for all appellate purposes. Nos. 51523/51524/51525 (08-13934). [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.]
06/18/2008Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Response due: June 20, 2008. [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] Nos. 51523/51524/51525 (08-15552).
06/19/2008MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Nos. 51523/51524/51525. (08-15683)
06/26/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motion. Fast Track Response due: July 17, 2008. Nos. 51523/51524/51525 (08-16280).
07/16/2008Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. Nos. 51523/51524/51525 (08-18300).
04/21/2009Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Nos. 51523/51524/51525. SNP09-RP/MD/KP. 09-09941
05/19/2009RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 09-11578
05/19/2009Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
05/22/2009RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 21, 2009. 09-11578