judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LOPEZ VS. SUNTECK TRANSPORT

Case Information: 51507
Short Caption:LOPEZ VS. SUNTECK TRANSPORTCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A510744Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:05/05/2008 / Berkson, LesterSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:05/14/2009How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/28/2008Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Frank J. Cremen check no. 19554.
04/28/2008Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) 08-10577
05/05/2008Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lester H. Berkson 08-11067
05/06/2008Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 08-11229
05/06/2008Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. - Docketing Statement. 08-11230
05/13/2008Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. -docketing statement served on settlement judge. 08-11863
07/21/2008Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. the parties will continue to negotiate until about October 10, 2008. 08-18723
09/29/2008Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 08-25076
10/09/2008Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 15 days to request transcripts; 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] 08-26110
10/20/2008Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 08-26930
01/06/2009BriefFiled Opening Brief. 09-00292
01/06/2009AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 09-00293
02/03/2009BriefFiled Answering Brief. 09-02929
02/03/2009AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 09-02931
02/25/2009BriefFiled Reply Brief. 09-04871
03/02/2009Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Compliance. To Appellant's Reply Brief. 09-05299
05/14/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Oral argument will not be scheduled in this appeal, and it shall stand submitted on the record and the briefs filed herein, as of the date of this order. 09-11939
05/14/2009Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
11/13/2009Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP09-RP/MD/KP. 09-27758
12/08/2009RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 09-29237
12/08/2009Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/18/2009RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 11, 2009. 09-29237