Case Information: 55285 | |||
Short Caption: | BOWMAN (ANTHONY) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 61801 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C244413 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/20/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 10-01617 | |
01/20/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
01/20/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Rough Draft Transcript Request. Due date: 10 days. | 10-01618 | |
01/20/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days | 10-01619 | |
02/19/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Conditionally Imposing Sanctions. Conditional sanction of $500 due: 15 days or transcript request form and case appeal statement due: 10 days. (Faxed to counsel for appellant.) | 10-04542 | |
03/19/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. to File Documents, Vacating Prior Conditional Sanction, and Imposing Conditional Sanction. Attorney Jeannie Hua shall have 10 days from the date of this order to file file-stamped copies of the case appeal statement, rough draft transcript request form. We vacate the conditional sanction imposed in our February 19, 2010, order. Conditional sanction of $ $500 due: 15 days or Fast Track Statement and Appendix or Motion due: 10 days. (Faxed to counsel for appellant.) | 10-07326 | |
03/29/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 10-08110 | |
03/30/2010 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 2/02/09, 2/18/09, 4/15/09, 9/29/09, 9/30/09, 10/01/09, 10/02/09, and 10/28/09. Court Reporter: Jill Jacoby. Filed in district court on: 2/24/10. | 10-08302 | |
03/30/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Case Appeal Statement. | 10-08303 | |
04/02/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Re: Transcripts, Granting Motion, and Vacating Sanction. Court Reporter Jill Jacoby's Certificate of Delivery due: 10 days. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: May 28, 2010. | 10-08616 | |
04/05/2010 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Jill Jacoby stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 10/28/09. | 10-08791 | |
04/13/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Court Reporter Jill Jacoby. | 10-09675 | |
04/15/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. for extension of time. Certificate of acknowledgement due 4/29/10. | 10-09791 | |
04/30/2010 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Jill Jacoby stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 9/29/09, 9/30/09, 10/1/09, 10/2/09. | 10-11180 | |
06/01/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 10-13980 | |
06/01/2010 | Fast Track Brief | Received Fast Track Statement. (via E-Flex). (FILED PER ORDER 06/04/10). | ||
06/04/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the fast track statement received via E-Flex on June 1, 2010. Appellant's Appendix due: 50 days. Fast Track Response due: 25 days. | 10-14360 | |
06/04/2010 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 10-14361 | |
06/08/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. with CD-ROM. Vols. 1 and 2. | 10-14694 | |
06/29/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 10-16970 | |
07/01/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. for extension of time to file the fast track response. Due: 20 days. | 10-17184 | |
07/15/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Motion to Dismiss Appeal for Lack of Jurisdiction. | 10-18225 | |
07/21/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion for Leave to File 12 Page Fast Track Response. | 10-18808 | |
07/21/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Filed Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. The motion for excess pages is approved. 12 pages granted. | 10-18809 | |
07/21/2010 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 10-18810 | |
07/21/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Response. | 10-18811 | |
09/09/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." | 10-23064 | |
10/04/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-25612 | |
10/04/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
10/14/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on October 11, 2010. | 10-25612 |