judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

FOSTER VS. COSTCO WHOLESALE CORP.

Case Information: 55284
Short Caption:FOSTER VS. COSTCO WHOLESALE CORP.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A549161 Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:01/21/2010 / Buchanan, WilliamSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:02/24/2012 at 10:00 AMOral Argument Location:Regional Justice Center
Submission Date:02/24/2012How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/20/2010Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) 10-01613
01/20/2010Filing Fee Filing Fee due. Filing fee will be fowarded by the District Court.
01/21/2010Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: William F. Buchanan 10-01736
01/22/2010Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Law Offices of Brian D. Nettles check no. 7948.
02/01/2010Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation and should be removed from the settlement program. 10-02738
02/05/2010Settlement Order/Procedural Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. and Reinstating Briefing.This appeal is removed from the settlement conference program. Transcript request due: 15 days. Opening brief due: 90 days. 10-03395
02/09/2010Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 10-03597
02/09/2010Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 10-03598
05/07/2010MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (30) days. 10-11786
05/07/2010Notice/OutgoingFiled Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief due date: June 7, 2010. 10-11791
06/08/2010MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time (Second). (30) days. 10-14598
06/10/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. for extension of time to file opening brief and appendix. Due: 7/7/10. 10-14927
07/12/2010MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time (Third). 10-17847
07/23/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Denying as Moot Motion for Third Extension of Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix. Opening Brief and Appendix due: July 26, 2010. 10-19001
07/27/2010BriefFiled Opening Brief. 10-19353
07/27/2010AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. 10-19354
08/25/2010BriefFiled Answering Brief. 10-21854
09/23/2010MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief (First). (30) days. 10-24569
09/24/2010Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Reply Brief due date: October 25, 2010. 10-24572
10/26/2010MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to file the Reply Brief (Second). (3) days. 10-27939
11/17/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion for Extension of Time as Moot. Appellant's Reply Brief due: 5 days. 10-30056
11/24/2010BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. 10-30698
02/16/2011Order/ProceduralFiled Oral argument will not be scheduled in this appeal, and it shall stand submitted on the record and the briefs filed herein, as of the date of this order. 11-05024
02/16/2011Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision.
04/27/2011Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Clerk to Schedule Oral Argument. The clerk of this court is directed to schedule this matter for oral argument before the panel on the next available calendar. The argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. 11-12424
04/27/2011Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled for June 15, 2011, at 11:30 a.m. at the Regional Justice Center in Las Vegas for 30 minutes before the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP11-MC/MG/KP 11-12442
06/01/2011Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. 11-16088
06/06/2011MotionFiled Stipulation and Joint Motion to Continue Oral Argument. 11-16562
06/07/2011Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion to Continue Oral Argument. The clerk of this court is directed to remove this matter from the June 15, 2011, argument calendar, and to reschedule it before the panel on the first available argument calendar. The argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. 11-16689
07/18/2011Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled for September 14, 2011, at 10:30 a.m. for 30 minutes in Carson City before the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP11-MC/MG/KP 11-21562
07/18/2011MotionFiled Motion for Withdrawal of Counsel and [Proposed] Order. 11-21593
07/28/2011Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion to Withdraw. We direct the clerk of this court to remove attorney Joshua Reisman and the law firm of Reisman Sorokac as counsel for appellant from this court's docket. 11-22801
08/10/2011Order/ProceduralFiled Order Rescheduling Oral Argument. This appeal is presently scheduled to be heard on September 14, 2011, at 10:30 a.m. in Carson City. The clerk of this court is directed to remove this matter from the September 14, 2011, argument calendar, and to reschedule it before the panel on the first available argument calendar. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. 11-24208
08/18/2011Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled for October 10, 2011, at 10:30 a.m. at the Regional Justice Center in Las Vegas for 30 minutes before the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP11-MC/MG/KP 11-25133
09/16/2011MotionFiled Unopposed Motion to Continue Oral Argument. 11-28447
09/23/2011Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. Accordingly, the start time for this oral argument is hereby changed. Argument shall be held on October 10, 2011, at the hour of 2:00 p.m. in Las Vegas. The argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. 11-29069
09/26/2011Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. 11-29202
10/06/2011MotionFiled Stipulation and Joint Motion to Continue Oral Argument [Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27(e)]. 11-30478
10/06/2011Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion to Continue Oral Argument. The clerk of this court is directed to remove this matter from the October 10, 2011, argument calendar, and to reschedule it before the panel on the first available argument calendar. 11-30536
01/04/2012Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled for February 24, 2012, at 10:00 a.m. in Las Vegas for 30 minutes before the Northern Nevdada Panel. 12-00257
02/15/2012Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. 12-04997
02/24/2012Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. To the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP12C-MC/KP/JH
12/27/2012Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded." Before Cherry/Pickering/Hardesty. Author: Cherry, C.J. Majority: Cherry/Pickering/Hardesty. 128 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 71. NNP12-MC/KP/JH 12-40827
01/22/2013RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 13-02191
01/22/2013Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/31/2013RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on January 28, 2013. 13-02191