Case Information: 55272 | |||
Short Caption: | THOMAS (DONALD) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 51873 , 59780 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C213426 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 04/20/2010 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/15/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 10-01350 | |
01/15/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
01/26/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 90 days. | 10-02183 | |
04/20/2010 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1-6. | 10-10260 | |
04/20/2010 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
06/09/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Reversal and Remand. "ORDER the judgment of the district court REVERSED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." NNP10-MC/NS/MG | 10-14790 | |
07/07/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-15948 | |
07/07/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
07/21/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on July 13, 2010. | 10-15948 |