Case Information: 55281 | |||
Short Caption: | GRISHAM VS. DIST. CT. (GRISHAM) | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 52667 , 53543 , 55394 , 57433 , 59102 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D368513 | Classification: | Original Proceeding - Civil - Proper Person Writ Petition |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/20/2010 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Michael H. Grisham check no. 2465. | ||
01/20/2010 | Petition/Writ | Filed Proper Person Petition for Writ. Emergency Petition for a Writ of Mandamus in Compelling the District Court to Issue Written Orders of the Court's Oral Judgements in Grisham vs. Grisham. | 10-01583 | |
01/27/2010 | Petition/Writ | Filed Supplement to Petition for Writ. Supplemental Emergency Petition for a Writ of Mandamus in Compelling the District Court to Issue Written Orders of the Court's Oral Judgements in Grisham vs. Grisham and Motion to Stay the Property Settlement. | 10-02238 | |
02/05/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Denying Petition. "ORDER the petition DENIED." NNP10-MC/NS/MG | 10-03287 | |
03/02/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. | 10-04193 | |
03/02/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
04/10/2012 | Motion | Filed Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record for Respondent. | 12-11396 | |
04/13/2012 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record for Respondent. | 12-11965 | |
04/19/2012 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Regarding Notice Withdrawing Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. No action will be taken on counsel's April 10 motion. | 12-12628 |