Case Information: 55275 | |||
Short Caption: | CASTANEDA VS. ZHELEZNYAK (CHILD CUSTODY) | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 63834 , 66695 , 73976 , 73976-COA | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D406243 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Child Custody/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/15/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. | ||
01/15/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) | 10-01362 | |
01/15/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days | 10-01364 | |
01/19/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Docket Entries. Confidential Cover Sheet (SEALED). | 10-01444 | |
02/08/2010 | Transcript Request | Filed Civil Proper Person Transcript Request Form. | 10-03493 | |
02/08/2010 | Other Incoming Document | Filed Proper Person Document. Certificate of Mailing. NOA and Transcript Request. | 10-03494 | |
02/19/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Directing Appellant to Pay Filing Fee or Comply with NRAP 24 (A). Filing fee due: 30 days. | 10-04615 | |
03/02/2010 | Other | Returned Mail. Order filed 2/19/10 addressed to Jesus Alberto Castaneda. Per USPS, "return to sender, attempted not known, unable to forward". Address updated per notice filed 2/8/10. Order remailed to new address. | 10-05490 | |
03/03/2010 | Brief | Filed Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | 10-05597 | |
03/17/2010 | Other Incoming Document | Filed Proper Person Document. Letter from Appellant Castanada. (Affidavit attached in Support of Motion to Proceed on Appeal in Forma Pauperis) | 10-07130 | |
03/17/2010 | Brief | Filed Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. Amended Statement of the Case. | 10-07134 | |
04/02/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Regarding Filing Fee. We direct appellant to re-file his application with the district court within ten days from the date of this order and to provide this court with a filed-stamped copy of the application. We further direct the district court to rule on appellant's in forma pauperis status application within 30 days from its filing and to submit a copy of the order to this court. | 10-08644 | |
04/19/2010 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Copy of order Findings of Fact and Order filed in district court on 4/14/10. (submitted by Judge F. Sullivan) | 10-10162 | |
05/03/2010 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Jesus Alberto Castaneda. Money Order No. 17007867617. | ||
05/03/2010 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on April 14, 2010. Findings of Fact and Order. Order denying appellant's motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. | 10-11294 | |
06/04/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Directing Transmission of Record and Directing Response. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. Responsent's Answer to Pro Per Appeal Statement due: 60 days. | 10-14479 | |
06/11/2010 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 and 2. | 10-15208 | |
08/03/2010 | Brief | Filed Response to Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. Respondent's Brief. | 10-20030 | |
10/04/2010 | Brief | Filed Proper Person Brief - Appellant's Reply. | 10-25656 | |
10/19/2010 | Other Incoming Document | Filed Proper Person Document. Letter with Courtesy Copy of Video (DVD/CD) files regarding Court proceedings described in Appellants Reply. | 10-27247 | |
10/28/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for Respondent. | 10-28325 | |
10/28/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for Respondent (with attachments). | 10-28329 | |
11/05/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. We direct the clerk of this court to remove respondent's counsel Jeffrey Ian Shaner from this court's docket. | 10-28977 | |
01/18/2011 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part and Remanding. ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED IN PART AND REVERSED IN PART AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order. | 11-01644 | |
02/14/2011 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 11-04727 | |
02/14/2011 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
02/24/2011 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on February 18, 2011. | 11-04727 |