judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

IN RE: PATRICE TAYLOR, APLT

Case Information: 10-FM-1167
Short Caption:IN RE: PATRICE TAYLOR, APLTClassification:Appeals - Family - Domestic Violence
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CPO3234-09Filed Date:09/14/2010

Opening Event Date:09/14/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:11/16/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/18/2012
Argued/Submitted:06/12/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/23/2013
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
Amicus-AppellantPublic Defender ServiceN
James W. KleinNY
Jaclyn S. FrankfurtYY
Amicus-AppelleeDomestic Violence Legal Empowerment & Appeals ProjN
Joan S. MeierNY
AppellantPatrice Taylor Y
Anna B. ScanlonYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Nicholas P. ColemanYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
09/14/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
09/28/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Anna Scanlon, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
10/12/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) 9/24/09 2/25/10 2/26/10 3/26/10 5/21/10 8/2010 (rt. needed)
11/16/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (12 pgs/tape) 9/24/09 proc.
11/16/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (41 pgs/tape) 2/25/10 proc.
11/16/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (54 pgs/tape) 2/26/10 proc.
11/16/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (15 pgs/tape) 3/26/10 proc.
11/16/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (31 pgs/tape) 5/21/10 proc.
11/16/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (8 pgs/tape) 8/20/10 proc. w/cd
11/16/2010RECORD COMPLETED
11/19/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC)
12/02/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY - briefing schedule pending the motion to recall mandate in 00FM1269 and 04FM1269 (mailed a copy of the motion to DC on 12/6/10, and notified appellant's counsel to serve D.C. with all future filings.) ta
12/17/2010ORDER GRANTING APPELLANT MOTION FOR STAY and this appeal is hereby stayed pending decisions in consolidated appeals nos. 00-FM-925 and 04-FM-1269. (ETW)
06/02/2011 On further consideration fo this court's order of December 17, 2010, which stayed this appeal pending decisions in appeals nos. 00-FM-925 and 04-FM-1269, and it appearing that the court has decided those matters, it is ORDERED, sua sponte, that the stay entered by this court on December 17, 2010, is hereby vacated. It is (MORE)
06/02/2011 ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (ETW)
06/02/2011PROCEED WITH APPEAL, NO LONGER ON HOLD/STAYED
06/23/2011RECORD COPIES
06/23/2011RECORD INDEX
07/12/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File (60 Days) Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
07/28/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File (60 Days) Appendix, Brief (Appellant) on or before 9/12/11.
09/16/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief and Appendix until November 16, 2011 (Appellant)Granted
09/23/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief and Appendix until November 16, 2011 (Appellant)
11/18/2011FiledMotion For Leave to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
11/30/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion For Leave to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
11/30/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
11/30/2011FiledAppendix (Appellant)
12/05/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief - until January 23, 2012 (Appellee United States)
12/12/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief - until January 23, 2012 (Appellee United States)
12/30/2011FiledSupplemental Record #7 (12-pgs/tape 1/22/10 proc.)
12/30/2011FiledSupplemental Record #8 (13-pgs/tape 4/20/10 proc)
12/30/2011FiledSupplemental Record #9 (15-pgs/tape 4/20/10 proc)
12/30/2011FiledSupplemental Record #10 (29-pgs/tape 6/09/10 proc.)
12/30/2011FiledSupplemental Record #11 (5-pgs/tape 8/6/10 proc.)
01/18/2012FiledBrief (Appellee)
01/18/2012FiledBriefing Completed
01/30/2012FiledMotion For Leave to File Brief (Amicus-Appellee)Granted
01/30/2012FiledMotion For Leave to File Other (Amicus-Appellee)
02/03/2012FiledMOTION - Appear Amicus
02/13/2012FiledAnswer/Response to motion of Public Defender Service for leave to participate as Amicus and to file Amicus Brief out of time (Appellee)
02/14/2012FiledOrder Granting - Motions for leave to file as amicus and lodged breif (DVLEAP) & motion participate as amicus and file biref (PDS),
02/14/2012FiledBrief (Amici Curiae) (DVLEAP)
03/15/2012FiledBrief (Amicus-Appellant - PDS)
03/20/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Regular
03/22/2012FiledMotion To Strike Brief of Appellee. (Appellant)Denied
03/22/2012FiledMotion to Adopt Pleadings of Amicus Curiae Public Defender Service in Support of Appellant. (Appellant)Granted
03/23/2012FiledOpposition to appellant's motion to strike brief of appellee (Appellee)
04/03/2012FiledOrder Granting Motion to Adopt Pleadings of Amicus Curiae Public Defender Service in Support of Appellant. (Appellant)
04/05/2012FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
04/10/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief in response to Amicus Curiae (Appellee)Granted
04/11/2012FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellee)
04/20/2012FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Amicus-Appellant)
04/24/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief in response to Amicus Curiae (Appellee) - 5/16/12
05/01/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
05/01/2012FiledBrief ( in response to brief for Amicus Curiae) (Appellee)
05/25/2012FiledMotion for leave to participate as Amicus in oral argument. (Amicus-Appellant)Granted
05/29/2012FiledOrder Denying aplt's motion to strike brief of U.S.
05/29/2012FiledMotion For Leave to File Reply Brief (Amicus-Appellant)Granted
05/31/2012FiledOrder Granting Public Defender Service to participate in oral argument.
06/01/2012FiledBrief (Amicus-Appellant)
06/01/2012FiledOrder Granting the Public Defender Service motion to file reply brief.
06/12/2012FiledArgued Before Judge Thompson, Easterly, Nebeker. (Jaclyn S. Frankfurt Esq.,for Amicus- appellant,) (Nicholas P. Coleman Esq.,for appellee.)
08/01/2013FiledReversed And Remanded (OPINION) (Judge Thompson,Easterly,Nebeker)
08/23/2013FiledMandate