judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

COOPER (RICKEY) VS. STATE

Case Information: 31667
Short Caption:COOPER (RICKEY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 44764 , 74159 , 74159-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C062939Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:05/03/1999How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/12/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
01/12/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.
02/06/1998Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Issued Notice to Transmit Required Document (order filed 11/24/97 and notice of entry filed 12/8/97) to Clark County Clerk. Due date: 10 days.
02/13/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsReceived Documents from District Court Clerk. Filed Certified Copy of Findings of Fact, Conclusion of Law and Order filed in the district court on November 24, 1997.
02/13/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsReceived Documents from District Court Clerk. Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Entry of Order filed in the district court on December 8, 1997.
01/19/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Re: Records on Appeal. Within 120 days from the date of this order, the clerk of the district court shall transmit to this court a certified copy of the complete trial court record in each of the above-identified appeals, as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings. 1[The records shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 31667, 33292, 33315, 33354, 33392, 33508, 33540, 33541, 33543, 33544.
05/03/1999Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. Vols. 1 through 5 (copies). Mailed on 4/28/99.
05/03/1999Other Other. Case submitted on the record this day.
05/03/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
06/10/1999Other Incoming DocumentReceived Proper Person Document. Received proper person Motion for Request to file Opening Brief and Motion for Appointment of Counsel. (Received original and two copies).
06/14/1999Other Incoming DocumentReceived Proper Person Document. Received proper person Appendix. (Received original and two copies).
07/24/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Remand. " . . . we remand this matter to the district court for an evidentiary hearing to determine whether appellant demonstrated adequate cause to excuse the procedural defects in his petition pursuant to Murray v. Carrier, and if so, whether appellant is entitled to relief on this claim pursuant to Callier." This order constitutes our final disposition of this appeal. Any subsequent appeal shall be docketed as a new matter. fn2[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 00-12701
08/21/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-14581
08/21/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/20/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 1, 2000. 00-14581