judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CITY OF GILLETTE, WYOMING v. HLADKY CONSTRUCTION, INC.

Case Heading (S-07-0292)
Case Number:S-07-0292Case Docketed On:12/19/2007
Linked To: S-07-0291 , S-07-0293
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Contract
Short Title:CITY OF GILLETTE, WYOMING v. HLADKY CONSTRUCTION, INC.
Full Title:CITY OF GILLETTE, WYOMING, Appellant (Defendant), v. HLADKY CONSTRUCTION, INC., Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantThe City of GilletteRaymond B. Hunkins
Amanda Hunkins Newton
AppelleeHladky Construction, Inc.Patrick J. Murphy
Tad T. Daly
Matthew Ryan Sorenson

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2008 WY 134
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
12/19/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
12/19/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
12/19/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
12/19/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
01/03/2008Motion - Consolidate cases S-07-0292 and S-07-0293. (Certificate of Service blank - calendared from date motion signed)MotionConsolidateFinal
01/07/2008Response/Objection - Motion to consolidate; counsel for appellees further requests that all three appeals be consolidatedResponse/ObjectionMotionFinal
01/08/2008Response/Objection - Motion. Appellant City of Gillette, Wyoming's objection to appellee's motion to consolidate all three cases.Response/ObjectionMotionFinal
01/08/2008Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
01/08/2008Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
01/23/2008Order - Consolidating cases: S-07-0292 and S-07-0293 consolidated for briefing; all three appeals consolidated for argument and opinionOrderConsolidating casesFinal
01/28/2008Motion - Other - leave to file/designate the trial transcript in the format it was filed in the district courtMotionOtherFinal
02/11/2008Event - Phone Call from counsel from appellant re transcripts. Transcripts in compliance except for those reported by South Dakota reporter - unable to comply with font and bottom page infoEventPhone CallFinal
02/15/2008Brief - Appellant; and received copy of brief on cd.BriefAppellantFinal
02/20/2008Order - Other granting motion to file and designate trial transcripts in the format it was filed in the District CourtOrderOtherFinal
04/03/2008Brief - Appellee's; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppelleeFinal
04/18/2008Brief - Appellant reply and copy of brief on cdBriefAppellant replyFinal
04/21/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
04/29/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, twenty-two volumes. Volumes I-VI, original papers; Volumes VII-XIV, exhibits; Volumes XV-XXI, transcripts; Volume XXII, blueprints.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
04/29/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
05/16/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
05/20/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Patrick Murphy and Tad Daly for appellees.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/21/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Raymond Hunkins and Amanda Hunkins for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/30/2008Record - Supplemental record on appeal from district court, one volume. Volume XXIII, original papers (per order to correct record entered in district court)RecordSupplemental record on appealFinal
06/19/2008Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Amanda Hunkins Newton and Raymond B. Hunkins for appellant; Tad T. Daly and Patrick J. Murphy, argument by Mr. Murphy for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
06/19/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
11/14/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
11/24/2008Motion - Fees and costsMotionFees and costsFinal
11/24/2008Motion - Fees and costsMotionFees and costsFinal
11/25/2008Event - Hardcopies received - Appellee HCI's motion and supplemental application for award of attorneys' fees and costs and third affidavits of Tad T. Daly; J. Kenneth Barbe; and Patrick J. Murphy.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/16/2008Order - Awarding attorney fees and costsOrderAwarding attorney fees and costsFinal
12/16/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
12/16/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
12/16/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
12/16/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
12/22/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 12/19/08 by Greta Evans (4 boxes/cards).ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
12/29/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card. Oversized exhibit that was found in vault (volume XXII) was signed for 12/24/08.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal