Case Information: 55268 | |||
Short Caption: | EDWARDS VS. HOTCHKISS | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A568297 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 04/26/2010 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/15/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. Filing fee will be fowarded by the District Court. | ||
01/15/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) | 10-01288 | |
01/19/2010 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from James L. Edwards check no. 1017. | ||
01/27/2010 | Transcript Request | Filed Civil Proper Person Transcript Request Form. | 10-02322 | |
02/01/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion. Notice of Nonappearance. | 10-02781 | |
02/02/2010 | Transcript Request | Filed Civil Proper Person Transcript Request Form. | 10-02881 | |
02/24/2010 | Brief | Filed Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | 10-04982 | |
03/15/2010 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Jill Hawkins stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 12/14/09 and 12/15/09. | 10-06840 | |
03/29/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 30 days. | 10-08141 | |
04/26/2010 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 4. | 10-10727 | |
04/26/2010 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
06/14/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. to Withdraw filed on 2/1/10. Having considered the motion, we grant it. | 10-15307 | |
11/10/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." | 10-29472 | |
12/06/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-31629 | |
12/06/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
12/21/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on December 16, 2010. | 10-31629 |