judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

QUINTERO (JOHN) VS. WARDEN

Case Information: 55279
Short Caption:QUINTERO (JOHN) VS. WARDENCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 48505 , 68565 , 68565-COA , 72885 , 72885-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR061701Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:01/10/2011How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/19/2010Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 10-01455
01/19/2010Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
01/21/2010Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 10-01746
01/21/2010Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 11/24/09. To Court Reporter: Molezzo Reporters. 10-01748
01/29/2010Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. 10-02625
02/26/2010TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. John Molezzo stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 11/24/09. 10-05165
04/30/2010MotionFiled Motion and Order/Excess Pages. Opening Brief. Granted: 37 pages. 10-11160
04/30/2010BriefFiled Opening Brief. BRIEF STRICKEN PER ORDER OF 10/25/10. 10-11161
04/30/2010AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief CD-ROM included. Vols 1-2. 10-11163
05/25/2010MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Suspend Briefing Schedule 10-13526
05/25/2010MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Dismiss Appeal or, Alternatively, for a Limited Remand to Allow for Additional Findings 10-13527
06/03/2010MotionFiled Response to Motion. Responses to: 1) Motion to Suspend Briefing Schedule; 2) Motion to Dismiss Appeal or, 3) Alternatively, Motion for a Limited Remand to Allow for Additional Findings. 10-14254
09/10/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motions and Remanding. Amended District Court Order due: 35 days. Briefing is suspended. 10-23211
10/22/2010Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of order Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Judgment filed in district court on 10/7/10. (submitted by Judge B. Adams). 10-27603
10/22/2010MotionFiled Stipulation Re: Briefing Schedule. 10-27637
10/25/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order Reinstating Briefing. The clerk of this court shall strike the opening brief filed on April 30, 2010. Opening brief and if necessary a supplemental appendix due 30 days. 10-27807
11/05/2010MotionFiled Motion and Order/Excess Pages. Granted: 39 pages. 10-29075
11/05/2010BriefFiled Opening Brief. 10-29078
11/05/2010AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief CD-ROM included. Vol. 3. 10-29080
12/07/2010BriefFiled Answering Brief. 10-31797
01/10/2011MotionFiled Motion and Order/Excess Pages. Granted: 21 pages. 11-00963
01/10/2011BriefFiled Reply Brief. 11-00965
01/10/2011Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision.
06/08/2011Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." 11-16948
06/20/2011MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Rehearing. 11-18359
06/21/2011Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant: petition for rehearing due: July 15, 2011. If no petition is filed on or before that date, the clerk of this court shall issue the remittitur on July 20, 2011. 11-18492
07/13/2011Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing (Appellant). 11-21052
09/19/2011Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer to Petition for Rehearing. Respondent's Answer due: 15 days. 11-28529
10/04/2011Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Opposition to Petition for Rehearing. 11-30155
10/06/2011MotionFiled Motion for Leave to File Reply to Answer to Petition for Rehearing. 11-30632
10/13/2011Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant: Reply to respondents' opposition to the petition for rehearing due: 10 days. 11-31606
10/24/2011Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Reply to Opposition to Petition for Rehearing. 11-32829
11/18/2011Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). 11-35624
11/23/2011Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. 11-36315
01/20/2012Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." EN BANC 12-02086
02/14/2012RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 12-04855
02/14/2012Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed
02/22/2012RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 16, 2012. 12-04855