Case Information: 55278 | |||
Short Caption: | AUSTERMAN (JOHN) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR091644 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 10/08/2010 | How Submitted: | On Briefs |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/19/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 10-01453 | |
01/19/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
01/19/2010 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 10/26/09, 10/27/09, 10/22/09, and 12/18/09. To Court Reporters: Stephanie Koetting and Joan Marie Dotson. | 10-01535 | |
02/01/2010 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 10-02765 | |
05/19/2010 | Motion | Filed Stipulation. | 10-13009 | |
05/19/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Filed Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief and Appendix due: June 18, 2010. | 10-13011 | |
06/18/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. (30) days. | 10-16020 | |
06/22/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: July 18, 2010. | 10-16252 | |
07/19/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Second Motion. | 10-18495 | |
08/02/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. for extension of time. Opening brief and appendix due 8/18/10. | 10-19837 | |
08/02/2010 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 10-19897 | |
08/02/2010 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Volume 1 | 10-19898 | |
08/02/2010 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Volume 2 | 10-19899 | |
08/02/2010 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Volume 3 | 10-19900 | |
09/01/2010 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. | 10-22504 | |
10/01/2010 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | 10-25449 | |
10/08/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order submitting for decision without oral argument. Oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. | 10-26367 | |
10/08/2010 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
12/13/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Order of Reversal and Remand. "ORDER the judgment of conviction REVERSED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." | 10-32396 | |
01/07/2011 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 11-00704 | |
01/07/2011 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | ||
01/12/2011 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on January 11, 2011. | 11-00704 |