Case Information: 51529 | |||
Short Caption: | ALPERN VS. BILL HEARD CHEVROLET, INC. | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A514875 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 07/16/2008 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/02/2008 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Rick Alpern check no. 1528. | ||
05/02/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) | 08-10946 | |
05/19/2008 | Brief | Filed Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | 08-12581 | |
06/13/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Directing Appellant to Properly Serve His Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. Appellant's Certificate of Service due: 15 days. fn3[We direct the clerk of this court to modify the caption to conform with the caption of this order.] | 08-15085 | |
06/24/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. - Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | 08-16130 | |
07/08/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Directing Transmission of Record and Directing Response. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. Respondent's Response (10 pages) to Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement due: 45 days. | 08-17295 | |
07/16/2008 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1-6. | 08-18207 | |
07/16/2008 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
08/22/2008 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. Response to Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | 08-21687 | |
10/08/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. (Bill Heard Chevrolet Corp.) | 08-25957 | |
11/07/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "We dismiss this appeal." SNP08-JH/RP/MD | 08-28561 | |
12/02/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 08-28588 | |
12/02/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
12/09/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 4, 2008. | 08-28588 |