Case Information: 55282 | |||
Short Caption: | REGENCY PARTNERS, LLC VS. DIST. CT. (BACM 2005-6 DECATUR APARTMENTS) | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 55274 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A594573 | Classification: | Original Proceeding - Civil - Prohibition |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/20/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. | ||
01/20/2010 | Petition/Writ | Filed Petition for Writ of Prohibition. and Motion for Stay. (TRANSFERRED TO DOCKET NO. 55274 PER ORDER FILED 03/22/10). | ||
01/20/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ. Exhibit 5. (TRANSFERRED TO DOCKET NO. 55274 PER ORDER FILED 03/22/10). | ||
01/25/2010 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from John M. Netzorg check no. 15736. | ||
02/22/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Show Cause. The January 20 document appears that petitioners intended to file it as a stay motion in the appeal pending in Regency Partners, LLC v. BACM 2005-6 Decatur Apartments, Docket No. 55274. Within 10 days petitioners shall show cause why this matter should not be administratively closed with the January 20 document refiled as a stay motion in Docket No. 55274. Real party in interest may file any reply within 10 days from the date that petitioners' response is served. | 10-04725 | |
03/05/2010 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. Declaration of Counsel in Response to February 22, 2010 Order to Show Cause. | 10-05804 | |
03/05/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion. Supplemental Declaration of Counsel in Response to 2-22-10 Order to Show Cause. | 10-05842 | |
03/22/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order to Administratively Close Docket. Transferring Motion and Administratively Closing Docket No. 55282. The clerk of this court shall refile the January 20 "Motion for Stay Pending Appeal and Original Writ Proceeding" as a stay motion in Docket No. 55274 and administratively close Docket No. 55282. Nos. 55274/55282. | 10-07469 | |
03/22/2010 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |