judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BEATTY (STERLING) VS. STATE

Case Information: 51522
Short Caption:BEATTY (STERLING) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 59965
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C230652Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:07/30/2009How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/01/2008Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
05/01/2008Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 08-10907
05/07/2008Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 08-11315
05/14/2008Other Returned Mail. Receipt for Docs to Sterling Beatty. Address updated per NDOC and remailed. 08-12118
06/02/2008Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement and Request Transcripts. 08-13783
06/16/2008MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. 08-15356
06/17/2008Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: No dates specified. Court Reporter: Maureen Schorn or Joseph D'Amato. Filed in district court on: Not filed in district court. 08-15364
06/17/2008Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 08-15366
06/19/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. . Proof of service on appellant of attorney Lizzie Hatcher's motion to withdraw due: 7 days. 08-15785
06/26/2008MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record-Robert O. Kurth, Jr. 08-16436
06/27/2008Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. - Certificate of Mailing Motion to Withdraw as Counsel to appellant. In Response to Order filed 06/19/08. 08-16490
08/29/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. No good cause having been shown by either attorney Lizzie R. Hatcher or attorney Robert O. Kurth, Jr. we deny both motions to withdraw. Ms. Hatcher and Mr. Kurth shall remain as counsel of record for appellant in this appeal. The opening brief and appendix in this matter are due by September 4, 2008. In light of this order, however, we extend that due date until October 6, 2008. 08-22399
10/07/2008MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (requesting no less than 60 days) 08-25922
10/23/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Order Granting Motion And Regarding Transcript Request Form. Counsel for appellant is strongly admonished for failing to comply with this court's procedural rules. Appellant shall have ten days from the date of this order to file and serve an amended transcript request form that strictly complies with the requirements of NRAP 9(a). Opening Brief due: December 5, 2008. 08-27251
11/12/2008Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 6/1/07, 7/6/07, 9/5/07, 11/28/07, 1/28/08, 1/31/08, 2/4/08 through 2/8/08, 2/11/08, 2/12/08, 2/13/08, 3/26/08, 4/10/08. Court Reporters: Joseph D'Amato and Maureen Schorn. 08-28806
12/08/2008TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Maureen Schorn stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 6/1/07; 11/28/07; 2/6/08; 2/8/08; 2/12/08; 3/26/08 and 4/10/08. 08-31232
12/08/2008MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. and Appendix. Second Request. 08-31266
12/16/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: January 30, 2009. Appellant's failure to file the opening brief on Januray 30, 2009, may result in the imposition of sanctions. 08-31840
12/19/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Regarding Transcripts. D'Amato: 20 days to a certificate of delivery. Fn1 [A copy of transcript request form is attached to this order.] 08-32318
01/15/2009TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. J. A. D'Amato stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: not given. 09-01242
02/03/2009BriefFiled Opening Brief. 09-02949
02/03/2009AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols 1-3. 09-02951
03/05/2009MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: 04/03/09. 09-05603
04/07/2009BriefFiled Answering Brief. 09-08700
05/11/2009MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 45 days. 09-11617
05/13/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motion. Reply Brief due: June 5, 2009. 09-11897
06/17/2009BriefFiled Reply Brief. 09-15027
07/30/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 09-18625
07/30/2009Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
12/04/2009Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP09-MC/NS/MG fn1[We have reviewed all documents that appellant has submitted in proper person to the clerk of this court in this matter, and we conclude that no relief based upon those submissions is warranted.] 09-29564
12/29/2009RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 09-30409
12/29/2009Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/11/2010RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 5, 2010. 09-30409