Case Information: 51518 | |||
Short Caption: | KEVER (MICHAEL) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR062660 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/01/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
05/01/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 08-10893 | |
06/09/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] NNP08-WM/MC/NS. | 08-14461 | |
06/17/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. of May 20, 2008. | 08-15397 | |
07/08/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 08-15442 | |
07/08/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
07/17/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 10, 2008. | 08-15442 |