judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CHAVEZ (JACINTO) VS. STATE

Case Information: 55263
Short Caption:CHAVEZ (JACINTO) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 70947 , 70947-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C217792 Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:04/15/2010How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/14/2010Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 10-01259
01/14/2010Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
01/26/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 90 days. 10-02177
04/15/2010Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. 10-09883
04/15/2010Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
05/07/2010Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Fn2[We have reviewed all documents that appellant has submitted in proper person to the clerk of this court in this matter, and we conclude that no relief based upon those submissions is warranted.] SNP10-JH/MD/KP 10-11861
06/01/2010RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 10-12645
06/01/2010Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/14/2010RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 4, 2010. 10-12645