Case Information: 55262 | |||
Short Caption: | HILL (DEVIN) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C232690 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 04/15/2010 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/14/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 10-01256 | |
01/14/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
01/26/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 90 days. | 10-02209 | |
04/15/2010 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. | 10-09885 | |
04/15/2010 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
06/10/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP10-MC/NS/MG. | 10-14943 | |
07/08/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-16491 | |
07/08/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
07/21/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on July 13, 2010. | 10-16491 |